There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Regulation Reduction, Reform, and Budget Act of 1993

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Congressional Budget Act of 1974 to establish a Federal regulatory budget and to impose cost controls on that budget, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
08/06/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
11/15/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
08/13/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security.
Action By: Committee on Government Operations
08/06/1993Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/06/1993Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/06/1993Referred to the House Committee on Government Operations.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/06/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (79)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 09/14/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/14/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/14/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/14/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 09/14/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 09/14/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 09/21/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/21/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 09/21/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/21/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/21/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 09/21/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 09/28/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 09/28/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/28/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/28/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 10/05/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/05/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 10/05/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/05/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/12/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/12/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 10/12/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/18/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 11/08/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 11/08/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 11/08/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 11/17/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 11/22/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 01/25/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/25/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 01/25/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 01/25/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 01/25/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 01/25/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/25/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 01/25/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 01/25/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 01/25/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 02/03/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 02/03/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/03/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 02/10/1994
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 02/10/1994
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 02/10/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 02/10/1994
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 02/10/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/10/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/10/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 02/10/1994
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 02/10/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/10/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 02/28/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/28/1994
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/28/1994
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/28/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/28/1994
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 03/23/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/23/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 04/18/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/05/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/05/1994
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 05/05/1994
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/17/1994
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 06/21/1994
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 06/21/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/21/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 08/18/1994

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Operations08/06/1993 Referred to
House Government Operations Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security08/13/1993 Referred to
House Judiciary08/06/1993 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations11/15/1993 Referred to
House Rules08/06/1993 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3005.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3005. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/06/1993)

Federal Regulation Reduction, Reform, and Budget Act of 1993 - Amends the Congressional Budget Act of 1974 to require the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) and the Congressional Budget Office (CBO) to jointly report to the President and the Congress on direct costs to the private sector of complying with Federal regulations. Requires such reports to be issued in five-year intervals.

Provides for initial and subsequent annual reports to the President and the Congress on an aggregate regulatory baseline which is a projection of the aggregate direct cost to the private sector of complying with Federal regulations for budget years and outyears.

Requires a concurrent resolution on the budget to include reconciliation directives specifying changes in laws and regulations necessary to reduce such direct costs and to reduce regulatory authority from the aggregate regulatory base. Provides for the allocation of aggregate two-year regulatory authority among congressional committees.

Requires the CBO to submit to the appropriate committees (except the Committees on Appropriations) an analysis of private sector regulatory costs for each public bill or resolution.

Requires the President's annual budget submissions to comply with reconciliation directives.

Amends the Regulatory Flexibility Act to require Federal agencies to prepare an analysis of the costs that will be incurred by small entities, other businesses, and individuals in complying with proposed agency rules. Requires the submission to the Congress and CBO and OMB of a cost estimate and cost benefit analysis of any new proposed regulations that would have an aggregate direct cost to the private sector of at least $10 million for any fiscal year.