Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 01/26/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 01/26/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 01/26/1993
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 01/26/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/26/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 01/26/1993
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 01/26/1993
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 01/26/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/26/1993
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 01/26/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/26/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/26/1993
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 01/26/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 01/26/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 01/26/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 01/26/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/26/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 01/26/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 01/26/1993
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 01/26/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/26/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 01/26/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 01/26/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 01/26/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 01/26/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/04/1993
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/04/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/04/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/04/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 02/04/1993
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/04/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/04/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 02/04/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 02/04/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 02/04/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/17/1993
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 02/17/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/17/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/04/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 03/04/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/04/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 03/04/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/04/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 03/11/1993
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/11/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/11/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 03/11/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/11/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/24/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 03/24/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/01/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/21/1993
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 04/21/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/21/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 04/21/1993
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 04/21/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/21/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 04/21/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/21/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 04/21/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/21/1993
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 05/05/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 05/05/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/19/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/19/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 05/19/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/19/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/27/1993
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/27/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 06/22/1993
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/22/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 07/01/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/13/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/13/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 07/13/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/13/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/22/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/28/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 08/06/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/09/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/23/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/06/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/19/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/28/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/28/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/24/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/09/1994
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/09/1994
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/09/1994
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 03/09/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/13/1994
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/21/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/28/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/18/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/19/1994