Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 01/26/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 01/26/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 01/26/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 01/26/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 01/26/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/26/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/26/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/26/1993
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 01/26/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 01/26/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 01/26/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/26/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/26/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 01/26/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 01/26/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 02/02/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 02/02/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 02/02/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 02/02/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/02/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 02/02/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 02/16/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/16/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/16/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/16/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 02/16/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/16/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/16/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 02/16/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/16/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 02/24/1993
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 02/24/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 02/24/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 02/24/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/03/1993
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 03/03/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/03/1993
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/03/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/16/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/16/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/16/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/16/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 03/29/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/29/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/02/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/20/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/28/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 05/11/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 05/25/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 05/25/1993
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 07/22/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 09/28/1993
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 10/06/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 10/06/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/16/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 11/18/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 01/25/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/08/1994