Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 09/14/1993
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 09/14/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 09/14/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 09/14/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 09/27/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/27/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 09/27/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 09/27/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 09/27/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 09/27/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/27/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 09/27/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/27/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 11/03/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/03/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 11/03/1993
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 11/03/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 11/03/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 11/03/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/03/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 11/03/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/03/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 11/03/1993
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 11/03/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/03/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/03/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/03/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/03/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 11/03/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 11/17/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 11/17/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/17/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 11/17/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 11/17/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/17/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 11/17/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/17/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 11/17/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 11/17/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 11/17/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 11/17/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 11/17/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 11/17/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 11/22/1993
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 11/22/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/03/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/03/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/03/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/03/1994
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13] 02/03/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/03/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/03/1994
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/02/1994
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/09/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/09/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/09/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 05/04/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 06/14/1994