Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 09/15/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 09/15/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 09/15/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 09/15/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 09/15/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 09/15/1993
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 09/15/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/21/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/21/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/21/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/21/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 09/21/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/21/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/21/1993
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 09/21/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/23/1993
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/23/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 09/23/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 10/05/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 10/05/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 10/05/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 10/05/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 10/05/1993
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/05/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 10/05/1993
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 10/05/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/05/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/07/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 10/13/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/13/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 10/22/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/22/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 10/28/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 11/19/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 11/19/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 11/19/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/21/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 11/22/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/22/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/23/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 02/01/1994
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 02/07/1994
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 02/08/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew