Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98]* 09/21/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/07/1993
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 10/07/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/07/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/07/1993
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 10/07/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/07/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 10/07/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 10/07/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/07/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 10/07/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 10/07/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 10/07/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 10/07/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/08/1993
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 11/08/1993
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 11/08/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/08/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/08/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 11/08/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/08/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/08/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 11/08/1993
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 11/08/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 11/08/1993
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 11/08/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 11/08/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 11/08/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 11/08/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 11/08/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 11/08/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 11/08/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/08/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 11/08/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 11/08/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 11/08/1993
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 11/08/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 11/08/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 11/22/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 11/22/1993
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 11/22/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 11/22/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 11/22/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 11/22/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 01/25/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 01/25/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 02/10/1994