Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 09/21/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 09/21/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/23/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 09/23/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 10/19/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 10/19/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/25/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/02/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/02/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/02/1994
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 03/11/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 04/20/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 04/20/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/03/1994