There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Health Care Information Modernization and Security Act of 1993

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Social Security Act to improve the exchange of information relating to health care services, to provide for measurement of health care quality, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/27/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date
07/20/1994Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5877)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/1994Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census, Statistics and Postal Personnel
10/22/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Labor-Management Relations.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
10/21/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/13/1993Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H7710, E2418)
Action By: House of Representatives
10/05/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/04/1993Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
10/04/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Forces and Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
10/01/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
10/01/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Census, Statistics and Postal Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
09/27/1993Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/27/1993Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/27/1993Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/27/1993Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/27/1993Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/27/1993Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/27/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (6)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services09/27/1993 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Forces and Personnel10/04/1993 Referred to
House Education and Labor09/27/1993 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Labor-Management Relations10/22/1993 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce09/27/1993 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment10/21/1993 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service09/27/1993 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census, Statistics and Postal Personnel10/01/1993 Referred to
03/02/1994 Hearings by
House Veterans' Affairs09/27/1993 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care10/05/1993 Referred to
House Ways and Means09/27/1993 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health10/01/1993 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3137. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/27/1993)

Health Care Information Modernization and Security Act of 1993 - Amends the Social Security Act to establish the Health Care Data Panel to: (1) develop and submit to the Office of Management and Budget for implementation proposed regulations for an integrated electronic health care data interchange system; (2) select and establish data and transaction standards, conventions, and requirements for the data interchange system; and (3) provide for appointment of a National Health Informatics Commission to advise the Panel on its activities. Authorizes appropriations.