Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 09/27/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 09/27/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 09/27/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 09/27/1993
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 09/27/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 09/27/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 09/27/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/27/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 09/27/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/27/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/27/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 09/27/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/27/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/27/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 09/27/1993
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1]* 09/27/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 09/27/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 09/27/1993
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4]* 09/27/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2]* 09/27/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 09/27/1993
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1]* 09/27/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 09/27/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/29/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/12/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/12/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/12/1993
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 11/03/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 11/03/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 11/08/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 01/26/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/26/1994