There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Congressional Budget Act of 1974 to provide for downward adjustments in section 602 and section 302 Appropriations Committees allocations and suballocations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/28/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
09/29/1993Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2276-2277)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/28/1993Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/28/1993Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H7040)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/28/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (99)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 09/28/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 09/28/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 09/28/1993
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 09/28/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/06/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 10/06/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 10/06/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 10/06/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 10/06/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 10/06/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/06/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 10/06/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/06/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 10/06/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 10/06/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 10/06/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/06/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/06/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 10/13/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 10/13/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/13/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/14/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 11/03/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/10/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/10/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/10/1994
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/17/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 03/17/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/17/1994

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Rules09/28/1993 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3145. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/28/1993)

Amends the Congressional Budget Act of 1974 to provide for downward adjustments in Appropriations Committees' allocations and suballocations when bills are passed that reduce appropriations and require rescissions. Requires the Congressional Budget Office to provide scorecards for such measures.