Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 09/28/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 09/28/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 09/28/1993
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 09/28/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 09/28/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/06/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 10/06/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 10/06/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 10/06/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 10/06/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 10/06/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/06/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 10/06/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/06/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 10/06/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 10/06/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 10/06/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/06/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/06/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 10/13/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 10/13/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/13/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/14/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 11/03/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/10/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/10/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/10/1994
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/17/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 03/17/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/17/1994