Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 09/29/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/29/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 10/26/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/28/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 11/03/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 11/19/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 01/25/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 01/25/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 02/10/1994