There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Forest Service to replace the Modular Airborne Fire Fighting System, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/06/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
07/19/1994For Further Action on Helium Provisions See H.R.3967.
12/01/1993Executive Comment Requested from Interior, USDA.
11/15/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/08/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Specialty Crops and Natural Resources.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
10/06/1993Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/06/1993Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/06/1993Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2352)
Action By: House of Representatives
10/06/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 10/28/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/28/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/28/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 10/28/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/28/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 10/28/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/28/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 11/03/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/03/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 11/03/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 11/03/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/03/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 11/03/1993
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22] 11/03/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/03/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 11/03/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 11/03/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 11/03/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 11/03/1993
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/09/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 11/09/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/09/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 11/19/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 11/19/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 11/19/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/19/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/22/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 11/22/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/16/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/20/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/20/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/14/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 07/14/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 07/14/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 07/14/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 07/14/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/14/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 07/14/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 07/14/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/22/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/22/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 07/22/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 08/01/1994

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture10/06/1993 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Specialty Crops and Natural Resources10/08/1993 Referred to
House Natural Resources10/06/1993 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources11/15/1993 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3224.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3224. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/06/1993)

Directs the Secretary of Agriculture to replace the Modular Airborne Fire Fighting System (System).

Repeals the Helium Act. Directs the Secretary of the Interior to: (1) sell related property and helium reserves; and (2) transfer the proceeds to the Secretary of Agriculture to pay for replacement of the System.