Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 10/28/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/28/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/28/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 10/28/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/28/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 10/28/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/28/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 11/03/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/03/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 11/03/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 11/03/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/03/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 11/03/1993
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22] 11/03/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/03/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 11/03/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 11/03/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 11/03/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 11/03/1993
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/09/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 11/09/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/09/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 11/19/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 11/19/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 11/19/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/19/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/22/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 11/22/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/16/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/20/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/20/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/14/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 07/14/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 07/14/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 07/14/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 07/14/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/14/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 07/14/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 07/14/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/22/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/22/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 07/22/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 08/01/1994