Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 08/06/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 08/06/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/08/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 09/08/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/13/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 09/15/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 09/23/1993
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/27/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 10/05/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 10/05/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 10/05/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 10/05/1993
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 10/05/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/12/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 10/12/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 10/15/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/20/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 10/20/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 10/20/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 10/20/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/20/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 10/20/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/20/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/20/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 10/20/1993
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 10/20/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 10/20/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 10/20/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 10/20/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/20/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 10/20/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/20/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 10/20/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 10/20/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/20/1993
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 10/20/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/20/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/20/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 10/20/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 10/20/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/20/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 10/20/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/20/1993
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/20/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 10/20/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/20/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 10/20/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 10/20/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/20/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 10/20/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 10/20/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 10/20/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/20/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 10/20/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 10/20/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/20/1993
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 10/20/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 10/20/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/20/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 10/20/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 10/20/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/20/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 10/20/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 10/20/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 10/20/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 10/20/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 10/20/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 10/20/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/20/1993
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/20/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 10/20/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 10/20/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 10/20/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/20/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 10/20/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/20/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 10/20/1993
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 10/20/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/20/1993
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 10/20/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 10/20/1993
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/20/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 10/20/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/20/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/20/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/20/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/20/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/20/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/20/1993
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 10/20/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 10/20/1993
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 10/20/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/20/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/20/1993
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/20/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 10/20/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 10/20/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/20/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/20/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/20/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 10/20/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 10/20/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 10/20/1993
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 10/20/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 10/20/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 10/20/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/21/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 10/21/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/21/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 10/21/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 10/21/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/21/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 10/21/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 10/21/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/21/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/26/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/26/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/26/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/26/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 11/08/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/10/1993
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 01/26/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 08/04/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/12/1994