Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 10/07/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 10/07/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 11/09/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/09/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/09/1993
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 11/09/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 11/09/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 11/09/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/09/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/09/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 11/09/1993
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 11/09/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 11/09/1993
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 11/09/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 11/09/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/09/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 11/09/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 11/09/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 11/19/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/19/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/01/1994
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 02/01/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/01/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 02/01/1994
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 02/08/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/08/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/01/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/01/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 03/01/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/01/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 03/01/1994
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/01/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/01/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/01/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 03/01/1994
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/01/1994
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/01/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/01/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/01/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 03/01/1994
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 03/01/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 03/01/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/01/1994
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/01/1994
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 03/03/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/03/1994
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 03/03/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/03/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/03/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/03/1994
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/03/1994
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/03/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/03/1994
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/03/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 03/03/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/03/1994
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 03/03/1994
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/03/1994
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/10/1994
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5] 03/10/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 03/10/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/10/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/10/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 03/10/1994
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/10/1994
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 03/10/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/10/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 03/10/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 03/10/1994
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/10/1994
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/10/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/10/1994
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/10/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/10/1994
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 03/10/1994
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 03/10/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/21/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/21/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/21/1994
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/21/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/21/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/21/1994
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 03/21/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 03/21/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 03/21/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/21/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/21/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/21/1994
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 03/21/1994
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 03/21/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/24/1994
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/24/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/24/1994
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/24/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/24/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/24/1994
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 04/14/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/14/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/14/1994
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 04/14/1994
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/14/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/14/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/14/1994
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 04/14/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 04/14/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 04/14/1994
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 04/14/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/14/1994
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/21/1994
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 04/21/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/21/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 04/21/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 04/21/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/21/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/28/1994
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 04/28/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 04/28/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 04/28/1994
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/28/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/12/1994
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 05/12/1994
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 05/12/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/12/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 05/12/1994
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 05/12/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/12/1994
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 05/12/1994
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 05/12/1994
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 05/12/1994
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 05/12/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/12/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/12/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 05/12/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/12/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 05/12/1994
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/12/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/12/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/12/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 05/20/1994
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 05/20/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/20/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/20/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 05/20/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/20/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 05/20/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/20/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/20/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/20/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/20/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 06/13/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/13/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/13/1994
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/13/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/13/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/13/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/13/1994