Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 10/07/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 10/07/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1]* 10/07/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 10/07/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 10/07/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 10/07/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 10/07/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 10/07/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4]* 10/07/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 10/07/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 01/26/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 01/26/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/26/1994
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/11/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/11/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/11/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 02/24/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/02/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/02/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/02/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 03/02/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/11/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 03/11/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 03/11/1994
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/11/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 03/11/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/11/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 03/11/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/11/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/17/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/17/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/17/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/17/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/17/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/17/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/17/1994
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/17/1994
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 04/28/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 04/28/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/14/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 07/14/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/14/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 07/14/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 07/14/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 07/14/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 07/14/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 08/12/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 08/12/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 08/17/1994
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 08/17/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 08/17/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 09/23/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/23/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/23/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/23/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/23/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/23/1994
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 09/23/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/23/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 09/23/1994