There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Adjudication Procedures Act of 1993

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to make improvements in the procedures used by the Department of Veterans Affairs in adjudicating claims for veterans benefits, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/13/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
11/17/1993Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Compensation, Pension and Insurance
10/18/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Compensation, Pension and Insurance.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/13/1993Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/13/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 10/26/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/26/1993
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/26/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/26/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/26/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/26/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/26/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 10/26/1993
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 11/10/1993
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 11/10/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 11/10/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 11/10/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 11/10/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 11/10/1993
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 11/10/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/10/1993
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 11/10/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 11/10/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/10/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 11/19/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 11/19/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 11/19/1993
Rep. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL-20] 02/02/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 02/02/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 02/02/1994
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 02/02/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/02/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/02/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/02/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/02/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 02/02/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 02/02/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/02/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/10/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/10/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 03/10/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/10/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/10/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/10/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 03/10/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 03/10/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/10/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/10/1994
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 06/08/1994
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/08/1994
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 06/08/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/08/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 06/08/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 06/08/1994
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 06/08/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 06/08/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 06/14/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/14/1994
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 06/27/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/27/1994
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/27/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 10/07/1994

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs10/13/1993 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Compensation, Pension and Insurance10/18/1993 Referred to
11/17/1993 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.3269.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3269. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/13/1993)

Veterans Adjudication Procedures Act of 1993 - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to provide that, under the work rate standards that apply to Department of Veterans Affairs employees who adjudicate claims for benefits that have been submitted to the Secretary, such employees shall not receive credit for work on a claim until the claim decision becomes final. Requires the Secretary to report annually to the Congress the status of claims for benefits before the Department during the preceding fiscal year, including the average length of time required for such adjudications. Requires a rating official to make the initial determination of the Secretary on all original and reopened claims filed with the Secretary.

Allows a single member (currently three) of the Board of Veterans' Appeals to be assigned to and make a determination on a proceeding before such Board. Makes such decision final unless the Chairman of such Board orders reconsideration, in which case three other Board members must hear the proceeding. Subjects decisions made by the Secretary or the Board to revision or reversal on the grounds of clear and unmistakable error.