Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 10/13/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7]* 10/13/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 10/13/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 03/24/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/24/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 03/24/1994
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/24/1994
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 03/24/1994
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/24/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/24/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/24/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 03/24/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/24/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 04/28/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/28/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/28/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/28/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/28/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/28/1994
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 04/28/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/28/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 04/28/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/28/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/28/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 04/28/1994
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 04/28/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/28/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 04/28/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/28/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 04/28/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 04/28/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/28/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/28/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/28/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/28/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/28/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/28/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/28/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/28/1994
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 04/28/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/30/1994
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 06/30/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 06/30/1994
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 06/30/1994
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 06/30/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/30/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 06/30/1994
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 06/30/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 06/30/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/30/1994
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 06/30/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/30/1994
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/30/1994
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/30/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/30/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/30/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/30/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 06/30/1994
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13] 06/30/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/30/1994
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 06/30/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/30/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/30/1994
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/30/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 06/30/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/30/1994
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/30/1994
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/30/1994
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 06/30/1994
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 06/30/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/30/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/30/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/30/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/30/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 06/30/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/30/1994
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 06/30/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/30/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 06/30/1994
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/30/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 06/30/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/30/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/30/1994
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/30/1994
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 06/30/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/30/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/30/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/30/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/30/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 06/30/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/30/1994
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/30/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/30/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 06/30/1994
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 06/30/1994
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 06/30/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 06/30/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/30/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/30/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/30/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 06/30/1994
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 06/30/1994
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/30/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/30/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/30/1994
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 06/30/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 06/30/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/30/1994
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/30/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/30/1994
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 06/30/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/30/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/30/1994
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/30/1994
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 06/30/1994
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 06/30/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/30/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/30/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/30/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/30/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 06/30/1994
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/30/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/30/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/30/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/30/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/30/1994
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/30/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/30/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/30/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/30/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/30/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 06/30/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 06/30/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/30/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/30/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/19/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 07/19/1994
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 07/19/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 07/19/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/19/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 07/19/1994
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/22/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 07/22/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/22/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/22/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/22/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 07/26/1994
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/26/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 07/26/1994
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 07/26/1994
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/26/1994
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4] 07/26/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/28/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 07/28/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/28/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/28/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/28/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 07/28/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 07/28/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 07/28/1994
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 07/29/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/29/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/29/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/29/1994
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/29/1994
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 07/29/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/29/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 08/09/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 08/09/1994
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 08/09/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 08/09/1994
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 08/09/1994
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 08/09/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 08/09/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 08/09/1994
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 08/09/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/09/1994
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 08/17/1994
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 09/21/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 09/30/1994