Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 10/14/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/25/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 01/25/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/01/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 02/03/1994
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 02/03/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/03/1994
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/07/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 02/10/1994
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 02/28/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/02/1994
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 03/10/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/21/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/22/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/24/1994
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 03/24/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 04/13/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/13/1994
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 04/18/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/20/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 04/26/1994
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 04/26/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/12/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/26/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/08/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/09/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 06/28/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/12/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/14/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/26/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 07/26/1994
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 08/02/1994