Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98]* 10/15/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 10/15/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4]* 10/15/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 10/15/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 10/15/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 10/15/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 10/15/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 10/15/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 10/15/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 10/15/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 10/15/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 10/15/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19]* 10/15/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/03/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 11/03/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 11/03/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/03/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 11/03/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 11/03/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 11/16/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/22/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/22/1993
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 01/25/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 01/25/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 01/25/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 01/25/1994
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 01/25/1994
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 01/25/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 01/25/1994
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 01/26/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/26/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/01/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 02/01/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/01/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 02/01/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/03/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 02/09/1994
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 02/10/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/22/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/22/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/28/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/01/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/08/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/08/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/10/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/10/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/16/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/16/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/16/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/16/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/16/1994
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/16/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/17/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/21/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/21/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/22/1994
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/23/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/24/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/24/1994
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 03/24/1994
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/12/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 04/12/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/12/1994
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/12/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/12/1994
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 04/13/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/13/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/14/1994
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 04/14/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/14/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/19/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 04/19/1994
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 04/20/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/28/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 04/28/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/28/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 04/28/1994
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 04/28/1994
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 05/03/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/03/1994
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 05/03/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/05/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 05/05/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/05/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/11/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/11/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/17/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/17/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/20/1994
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/20/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/26/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/26/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/26/1994
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/08/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/08/1994
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 06/08/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 06/08/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/16/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/16/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/16/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 06/17/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/17/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 06/21/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/22/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/27/1994
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 06/28/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 07/12/1994
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/12/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 07/21/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 07/25/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 07/28/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 07/28/1994
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 08/05/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 08/08/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 08/18/1994
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 09/12/1994