Summary: H.R.3313 — 103rd Congress (1993-1994)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
House agreed to Senate amendment with amendment (10/07/1994)

TABLE OF CONTENTS:

Title I: General Medical Authorization

Title II: Construction Authorities

Veterans Health Programs Extension Act of 1994 - Title I: General Medical Authorities - Repeals a Federal provision requiring a veteran, in order to be eligible for counseling for sexual trauma from the Department 111Veterans Affairs, to seek such counseling within two years after release from active military service. Extends through December 31, 1998, the authority of the Department to provide such counseling services. Repeals a provision limiting to one year the authorized length of such counseling. Provides a priority for such care in furnishing medical services with funds appropriated for the medical care of veterans. Allows any veteran (currently, only women) to receive such counseling. Requires with respect to such counseling: (1) the availability of a toll-free telephone number; (2) appropriate training to Department personnel who provide counseling assistance; and (3) a report to the Congress on the operation of the telephone assistance service.

(Sec. 102) Requires the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, in conducting or supporting clinical research, to ensure that women and minority veterans are included as subjects in such research. Directs the Secretary to foster and encourage the initiation and expansion of research relating to the health of women veterans, requiring specified consultation during such research.

Amends the Veterans Health Care Act of 1992 to: (1) repeal a provision requiring the expansion of research relating to women veterans; and (2) require an appropriate test sample of age, background, rank, and service branch under a provision requiring a population study concerning women veterans.

(Sec. 103) Extends for an additional year the authority: (1) to provide priority health care to veterans exposed to toxic substances during their military service; (2) for a pilot program for noninstitutional alternatives to nursing home care; (3) of the Secretary to enter into enhanced-use leases of real property; (4) for community-based residential care for homeless chronically mentally ill veterans and other veterans under the Veterans' Benefits and Services Act of 1988; and (5) for a demonstration program of compensated work therapy and therapeutic transitional housing for certain veterans. Amends the Department of Veterans Affairs Nurse Pay Act of 1990 to extend until February 1, 1995, the deadline of a required report on the findings of a study concerning noninstitutional alternatives to nursing home care.

(Sec. 104) Authorizes the Secretary, from February 28, 1994, through June 1, 1994, to contract with facilities in the Republic of the Philippines other than the Veterans Memorial Medical Center to furnish hospital care and medical services to veterans for nonservice-connected connected disabilities if such veterans are unable to defray the cost of such care.

(Sec. 105) Ratifies certain action taken by the Secretary during the period between July 1, 1994, and the date of enactment of this Act with respect to the furnishing of hospital and nursing home care to eligible veterans.

Title II: Construction Authorization - Authorizes the Secretary to carry out the major medical facility projects and leases for the Department for which funds are requested in the FY 1995 budget, as well as certain prior year projects and leases. Authorizes the Secretary to carry out certain additional major medical facility construction projects, each with a cost limitation. Authorizes appropriations for such projects and leases, with limitations.