Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 10/20/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 10/20/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19]* 10/20/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 10/20/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 10/28/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/08/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 11/08/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/01/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/01/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/01/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 02/01/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/08/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/08/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 02/08/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 02/08/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/09/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/21/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 03/21/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/12/1994
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 05/04/1994
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 05/04/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/04/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 05/04/1994
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 05/04/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 05/24/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 05/24/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/09/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/29/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/29/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/29/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/29/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 08/10/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 08/10/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 08/10/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 09/21/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/21/1994
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 10/07/1994