Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 11/10/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 11/10/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/10/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/10/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 11/10/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 11/10/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/10/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 11/10/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/10/1993
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/10/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 11/10/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/10/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 11/10/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/10/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 11/10/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/10/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/10/1993
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 11/10/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 11/10/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/10/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 11/10/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 11/10/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 11/10/1993
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 11/10/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 11/10/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 11/10/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 11/10/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/10/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 11/10/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 11/10/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/10/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 11/10/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 11/10/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 11/10/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/10/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 11/10/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/10/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 11/10/1993
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 11/15/1993
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 11/17/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 11/17/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 11/17/1993
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 11/17/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 11/19/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 11/20/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 11/22/1993
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/22/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 11/22/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 11/22/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 11/23/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 11/23/1993
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 11/23/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 11/23/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 11/23/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/23/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 11/26/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 11/26/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 01/25/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 01/25/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 01/25/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 01/25/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 01/25/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 01/25/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 01/25/1994
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/25/1994
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 01/26/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 02/01/1994
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 02/01/1994
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/01/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 02/01/1994
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 02/01/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/02/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 02/02/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/02/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 02/02/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 02/02/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/02/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 02/03/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 02/03/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 02/03/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 02/07/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/07/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/07/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/07/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 02/08/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/08/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 02/08/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/08/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 02/08/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/10/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 02/10/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/10/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/11/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/22/1994
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/22/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/22/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 03/01/1994
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/02/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 03/02/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 03/08/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/11/1994
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/16/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/16/1994
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 03/16/1994
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/21/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/22/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/22/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 04/12/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/13/1994
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/11/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 05/20/1994
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 08/09/1994