Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 10/26/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 10/26/1993
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 10/26/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 10/26/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 11/20/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 11/20/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 11/20/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/20/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 11/20/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 11/20/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/01/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/01/1994
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 02/01/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/01/1994
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 02/01/1994
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 02/01/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/01/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 02/01/1994
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/01/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/01/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/01/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/10/1994
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/10/1994
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/10/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/10/1994
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/10/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/10/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/17/1994
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 03/17/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/17/1994