Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 10/27/1993
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 10/27/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 10/27/1993
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 10/27/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 10/27/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 10/27/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19]* 10/27/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 10/27/1993
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98]* 10/27/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 10/27/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 10/27/1993
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 10/27/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 10/27/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 10/27/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1]* 10/27/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 10/27/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 10/27/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 10/27/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 10/27/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 10/27/1993
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5]* 10/27/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 10/27/1993
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4] 10/28/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 10/28/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/28/1993
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 11/03/1993
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 11/03/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 11/03/1993
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 11/03/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 11/03/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/03/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 11/03/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 11/03/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 11/08/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 11/08/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 11/09/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 11/09/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/09/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 11/09/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 11/09/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 11/09/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/09/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 11/19/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 11/19/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 11/19/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 11/19/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 11/19/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 11/19/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 11/19/1993
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 11/19/1993
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 11/19/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 11/19/1993
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 11/19/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/19/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 11/19/1993
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 11/22/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 11/22/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 11/22/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 11/22/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 11/22/1993
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 01/25/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 01/25/1994
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 01/25/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 01/25/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/25/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/25/1994
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 01/25/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 01/25/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/25/1994
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 01/25/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 01/25/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 01/25/1994
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/25/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 02/01/1994
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 02/01/1994
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 02/01/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/01/1994
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 02/01/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 02/01/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 02/01/1994
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/01/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/01/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/01/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/01/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/01/1994
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/01/1994
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 02/03/1994
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 02/03/1994
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 02/03/1994
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 02/03/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 02/08/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/08/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/10/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/10/1994
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 02/23/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 02/23/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/23/1994
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 02/23/1994
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/23/1994
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/23/1994
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 02/23/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 03/02/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/02/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/02/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/02/1994
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/02/1994
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 03/02/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/02/1994
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/02/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 03/02/1994
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/03/1994
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 03/03/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/09/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/09/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/09/1994
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/09/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/09/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 03/09/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 03/09/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/11/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 03/11/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 03/16/1994
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 03/16/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/16/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/16/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/22/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/22/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/22/1994
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/13/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/13/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 04/13/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 04/13/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/13/1994
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 04/13/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/13/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 04/13/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/13/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 04/13/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/13/1994
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/19/1994
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 04/19/1994
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 04/19/1994
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/02/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 05/02/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/02/1994
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/02/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/02/1994
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/02/1994
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/02/1994
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 05/02/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/02/1994
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 05/02/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 05/02/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/02/1994
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/02/1994
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 05/02/1994
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/05/1994
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 05/05/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 05/05/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/05/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 05/12/1994
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 05/12/1994
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/20/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/10/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/10/1994
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 07/19/1994
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 07/19/1994
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 07/20/1994
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 07/26/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/26/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/28/1994
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 07/28/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/28/1994
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/28/1994
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 07/28/1994
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 08/10/1994