Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 10/28/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 10/28/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 11/18/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/18/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/18/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 11/18/1993
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 11/18/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/18/1993
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 11/18/1993
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 01/26/1994
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 01/26/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/26/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 01/26/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/26/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/26/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/23/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/23/1994
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/23/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 03/09/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/09/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/09/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/09/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/12/1994
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 04/12/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/22/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/22/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/22/1994
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/21/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 07/21/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/21/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/21/1994
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 08/03/1994
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/03/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 08/10/1994
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 08/19/1994
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 10/07/1994