Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/13/1994
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/13/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/13/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/13/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/13/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 04/13/1994
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 04/13/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 04/13/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/13/1994
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 04/13/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 04/13/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/13/1994
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/13/1994
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 04/13/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/13/1994
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 04/13/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 04/13/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 04/13/1994
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/13/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 04/13/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/13/1994
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 04/13/1994
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 04/13/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/13/1994
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 04/13/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/13/1994
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 04/13/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 04/13/1994
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 04/13/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/13/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/13/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/13/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 04/13/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/13/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 04/13/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/13/1994
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13] 04/13/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/13/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/13/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 04/13/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/13/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 04/13/1994
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/13/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 04/13/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/13/1994
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 04/13/1994
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/13/1994
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 04/13/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/13/1994
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 04/13/1994
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 04/13/1994
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 04/13/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/13/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 04/13/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/13/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/13/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 04/13/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/13/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/13/1994
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/13/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/13/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/13/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/13/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 04/13/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/13/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/13/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/13/1994
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 04/13/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/13/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/13/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/13/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 04/13/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/13/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/13/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 04/13/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 04/13/1994
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 04/13/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/13/1994
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 04/13/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 04/13/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/13/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 04/13/1994
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 04/13/1994
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 04/13/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 04/13/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/13/1994
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/13/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 04/13/1994
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/13/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/13/1994
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 04/13/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/13/1994
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 04/13/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/19/1994
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 04/19/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/19/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/19/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 04/19/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 05/24/1994
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 05/24/1994
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 05/24/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/24/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/24/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 05/24/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/24/1994
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/25/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/25/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 05/25/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/29/1994
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 06/29/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/29/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/29/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/29/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 06/29/1994
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 06/29/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 06/29/1994
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 06/29/1994