There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To remove a restriction on the authority of the Secretary of Agriculture to enter into agreements with other Federal agencies to acquire goods and services directly related to improving or utilizing the firefighting capability of the Forest Service and to require a report regarding the firefighting procedures of the Forest Services.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/03/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
11/05/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Specialty Crops and Natural Resources.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
11/03/1993Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/03/1993Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2768)
Action By: House of Representatives
11/03/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 11/03/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 11/03/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 11/09/1993
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/09/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/09/1993
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 11/09/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/09/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 11/19/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/19/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 11/19/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 11/19/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 11/19/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/19/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 11/19/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/22/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/19/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/19/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/14/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 07/14/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 07/14/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/14/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 07/14/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 07/14/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/14/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/22/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/22/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 07/22/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 08/01/1994

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture11/03/1993 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Specialty Crops and Natural Resources11/05/1993 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3440.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3440. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/03/1993)

Authorizes the Secretary of Agriculture (Secretary) to enter into agreements with other Federal agencies to acquire firefighting goods and services without regard to certain commercial contracting provisions.

Directs the Secretary to report to the Congress on Forest Service and Department of Agriculture firefighting capabilities and methods.