Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/11/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/28/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/28/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/29/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 08/01/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 08/08/1994