Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 11/04/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 11/04/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 11/04/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 11/04/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 11/04/1993
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 11/04/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 11/04/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 11/04/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1]* 11/04/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 11/04/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/15/1993
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 11/15/1993
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 11/16/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/16/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/20/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/20/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/20/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/25/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 01/25/1994
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/29/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 08/01/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 08/02/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew