There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Apollo 11 Moon Landing 25th Anniversary Commemorative Coin Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of the Treasury to mint coins in commemoration of the 25th anniversary of the Apollo 11 Moon landing.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/09/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
12/06/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Credit and Insurance.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs
11/09/1993Referred to the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/09/1993Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2831-2832)
Action By: House of Representatives
11/09/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15]* 11/09/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 11/09/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 11/09/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1]* 11/09/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 11/09/1993
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 11/09/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 11/09/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19]* 11/09/1993
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 11/09/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 11/09/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 11/22/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 11/22/1993
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 11/22/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 11/22/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 11/22/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 11/22/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/22/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 11/22/1993
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 11/23/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/08/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/08/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/08/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/08/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 06/08/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 06/08/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/08/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 06/08/1994
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/08/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/08/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 06/08/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/08/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/08/1994
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 06/08/1994
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/08/1994
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/08/1994
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 06/08/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 06/08/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/08/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/08/1994

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs11/09/1993 Referred to
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affrs Subcommittee on Consumer Credit and Insurance12/06/1993 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3480. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/09/1993)

Apollo 11 Moon Landing 25th Anniversary Commemorative Coin Act - Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to: (1) issue coins emblematic of humans first landing on the moon 25 years ago; and (2) pay surcharges received from coin sales to the Aerospace Education Alliance to develop and implement a math and science skills program for America's teachers in grades kindergarten through eight.