Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 02/24/1994
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/24/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 02/24/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/24/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/24/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/24/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 02/24/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/24/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 03/10/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/10/1994
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 03/10/1994
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 03/10/1994
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 03/10/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/10/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/10/1994
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/10/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/10/1994
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 03/10/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/10/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/10/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 03/10/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 03/10/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/10/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/10/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/10/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 03/10/1994
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 03/10/1994
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 03/10/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/10/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 03/10/1994
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/10/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 03/10/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/10/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/10/1994
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/10/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/22/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/22/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/22/1994
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/22/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 03/22/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 03/22/1994
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/22/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 03/22/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/22/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/22/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 03/22/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 03/22/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/22/1994
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/13/1994
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 04/13/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/13/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 04/13/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 04/13/1994
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/13/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/13/1994
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 04/13/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/13/1994
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/13/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/13/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 04/13/1994
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/13/1994
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/14/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 04/19/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 04/19/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 04/19/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/19/1994
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 04/19/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/19/1994
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 04/19/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 04/19/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/19/1994
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 04/19/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 04/19/1994
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/04/1994
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 05/04/1994
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/04/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/04/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/04/1994
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/04/1994
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/04/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/04/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 05/04/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/05/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/05/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 05/05/1994
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 05/05/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/05/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 05/05/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/05/1994
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/05/1994
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 05/05/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/05/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/10/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/10/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 05/10/1994
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 05/10/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/10/1994
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/10/1994
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/11/1994
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 05/11/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/17/1994
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/17/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 05/17/1994
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/17/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 05/19/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/19/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/19/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/19/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 05/19/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/19/1994
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 05/24/1994
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/24/1994
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 05/26/1994
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/26/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 06/08/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 06/08/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/08/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 06/08/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 06/23/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/23/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 06/23/1994
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/29/1994
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 07/18/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 08/03/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/27/1994