Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 11/10/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/22/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 11/22/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 11/22/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 11/22/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/03/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/10/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/10/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 03/10/1994
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 03/10/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/10/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/10/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/19/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/19/1994
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/19/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/19/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/19/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/19/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 04/19/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 04/19/1994
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/19/1994
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/19/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/19/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/21/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/21/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/21/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 09/13/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/13/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/13/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/13/1994
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 09/13/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 09/13/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 09/13/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 09/28/1994