Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 11/19/1993
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 11/19/1993
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/19/1993
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5] 11/19/1993
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 11/19/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 11/19/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 11/19/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/20/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 11/22/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 11/22/1993
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 01/25/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/25/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/25/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 02/01/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/01/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 02/01/1994
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 02/01/1994
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 02/08/1994
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/23/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 02/23/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/23/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/23/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/10/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/10/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/21/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/23/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/23/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 04/12/1994
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/14/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 04/14/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/19/1994
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 04/19/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 04/26/1994
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 04/26/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 04/26/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 04/26/1994
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 05/05/1994
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/23/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/22/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/22/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/13/1994