Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 11/10/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 11/10/1993
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 11/10/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 11/10/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 11/10/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/22/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 11/22/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/22/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/22/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/22/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 11/22/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 02/02/1994
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 02/02/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/02/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 02/02/1994
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/02/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/02/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/02/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/02/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 02/02/1994
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/02/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 02/02/1994
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 02/23/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/23/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/23/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/16/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/16/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 03/17/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/23/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/23/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/23/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 05/17/1994
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 05/17/1994
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/08/1994
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 06/08/1994
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/23/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/23/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/23/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/23/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 06/23/1994
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 06/23/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/23/1994
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/23/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/23/1994
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/23/1994
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/23/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 06/23/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/23/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 06/23/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 06/23/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/23/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/23/1994
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 06/23/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/23/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/23/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/23/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 06/23/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 06/23/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/23/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 06/23/1994
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 06/23/1994
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/23/1994
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 06/23/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/23/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/23/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/23/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/23/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/23/1994
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/23/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/23/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 06/23/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/23/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/23/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/23/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/23/1994
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 06/23/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 06/23/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 06/23/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/23/1994
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/23/1994
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/23/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/23/1994
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 06/23/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/23/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/23/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/23/1994
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 06/23/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 06/23/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/23/1994
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 07/12/1994
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 07/12/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/12/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 07/12/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 07/12/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 07/12/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/12/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 07/12/1994
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/12/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 07/12/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 07/12/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/12/1994
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 07/12/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 07/12/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/12/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/12/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/12/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/12/1994
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/12/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/12/1994
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 07/12/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 07/12/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 07/12/1994
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 07/19/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/19/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 07/19/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/19/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/19/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/19/1994
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/19/1994
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 07/19/1994
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 07/19/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/19/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/19/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 07/19/1994
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 07/19/1994
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/19/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 07/19/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/19/1994
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 07/19/1994
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 07/19/1994
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/19/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/19/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/19/1994
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 08/11/1994
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 08/11/1994
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 08/11/1994
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 08/11/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 08/11/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 08/11/1994