Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/03/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 02/03/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 02/03/1993
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 02/03/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/03/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/03/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/03/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 02/03/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/03/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/03/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/03/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/03/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 02/03/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 02/03/1993
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 02/03/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/03/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/03/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/03/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/03/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/03/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/11/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/11/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 03/11/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/11/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 03/11/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/11/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 03/11/1993
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 03/11/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/11/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/11/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/11/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/11/1993
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 04/01/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 04/01/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/01/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/01/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 04/01/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 04/01/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/01/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 04/01/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/01/1993
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/01/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/01/1993
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/06/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/06/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/06/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 05/06/1993
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/06/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/06/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 06/17/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/17/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/17/1993
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 06/17/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 06/17/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 08/06/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 08/06/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 08/06/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 08/06/1993
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 08/06/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/14/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/14/1993
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/25/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 01/25/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 01/25/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 04/14/1994