There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To clarify the regulatory oversight exercised by the Rural Electrification Administration with respect to certain electric borrowers.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/17/1993Became Public Law No: 103-201.
12/17/1993Signed by President.
12/08/1993Presented to President.
11/22/1993Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S16983)
11/19/1993Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
11/19/1993Reported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 103-381.
11/16/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/26/1994HouseFavorable Executive Comment Received from USDA.
12/17/1993Became Public Law No: 103-201.
12/17/1993Signed by President.
12/08/1993HousePresented to President.
11/26/1993SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/22/1993SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S16983)
11/19/1993SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
11/19/1993-5:22pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/19/1993-5:22pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
11/19/1993-5:17pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H10258-10259)
11/19/1993-5:17pmHouseMr. de la Garza asked unanimous consent to discharge the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union and consider.
11/19/1993HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 209.
11/19/1993HouseReported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 103-381.
11/17/1993HouseOrdered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
11/17/1993HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
11/16/1993HouseReferred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
11/16/1993HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2904)
11/16/1993HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 11/16/1993

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture11/16/1993 Referred to
11/17/1993 Markup by
11/19/1993 Reported by H.Rept 103-381

No related bill information was received for H.R.3514.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3514. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/16/1993)

Amends the Rural Electrification Act of 1936 to direct the Administrator of the Rural Electrification Administration (REA), guided by private lending practices, to issue regulations for specified borrowers that minimize administrative requirements and restrictions.

Provides for REA subordination or sharing of related liens.