Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 11/17/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 02/23/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/23/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/23/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 02/23/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/23/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 02/23/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/23/1994
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/23/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 02/23/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 02/23/1994
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/28/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/28/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 06/28/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/28/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 06/28/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/28/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/28/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/28/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/28/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 06/28/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 06/28/1994
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/28/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 06/28/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 08/03/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 08/03/1994
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 08/03/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 08/03/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 08/03/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 08/03/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 08/03/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 08/03/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 08/05/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 08/05/1994
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 08/21/1994
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 08/21/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 08/21/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 08/21/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/19/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/19/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/19/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/19/1994
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 10/06/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/06/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/06/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/07/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/07/1994