Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 11/17/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 11/23/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/23/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/25/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 01/25/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/25/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 01/25/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 01/25/1994
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/25/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/25/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/25/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 01/25/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 01/25/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 01/25/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/01/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/01/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 02/02/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/02/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 02/02/1994
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/02/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 02/02/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 02/02/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 02/08/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/08/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/08/1994
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 02/08/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/08/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/08/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/10/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 02/28/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 02/28/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 02/28/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/03/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/03/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/03/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/15/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/15/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/14/1994
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 04/20/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/21/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/21/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/26/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/26/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew