There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Code of Conduct on Arms Transfers Act of 1993

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit United States military assistance and arms transfers to foreign governments that are undemocratic, do not adequately protect human rights, are engaged in acts of armed aggression, or are not fully participating in the United Nations Register of Conventional Arms.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/18/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
02/01/1994Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H97-98)
Action By: House of Representatives
12/06/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on International Security, International Organizations and Human Rights.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
11/19/1993Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2939-2940)
Action By: House of Representatives
11/18/1993Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/18/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (99)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 02/09/1994
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/09/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/09/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 02/09/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 02/09/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/09/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/09/1994
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/09/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/09/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 02/09/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 03/03/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 03/03/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/03/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/03/1994
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/03/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/03/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 03/03/1994
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 03/03/1994
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/03/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 03/03/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/03/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/03/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 03/03/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/03/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/03/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/03/1994
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 03/03/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/03/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/03/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/03/1994
Rep. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL-20] 03/03/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/03/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/19/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/19/1994
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 04/19/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/19/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/19/1994
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/19/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/19/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/19/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/19/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/19/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/19/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 04/19/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 04/19/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/19/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/19/1994
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 04/19/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/19/1994
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 04/19/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/19/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/19/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 04/19/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/19/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/19/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/19/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/19/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/19/1994
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 04/19/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/19/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/19/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 04/19/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/19/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 04/19/1994
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 05/11/1994
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/11/1994
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/11/1994
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 05/11/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/12/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/12/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/12/1994
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 07/12/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/12/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/12/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 07/12/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 07/12/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/12/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/12/1994
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/12/1994
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/12/1994
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/12/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/12/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/12/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 07/12/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 07/12/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 08/04/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 08/04/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 08/04/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 08/04/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 08/18/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 08/18/1994
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 08/18/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/28/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/29/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 09/29/1994

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs11/18/1993 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on International Security, International Organizations, and Human Rights12/06/1993 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3538. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/18/1993)

Code of Conduct on Arms Transfers Act of 1993 - Prohibits U.S. military assistance and arms transfers to a foreign government unless the President certifies to the Congress that the government: (1) meets specified conditions regarding democracy, including that it was chosen in free and fair elections and promotes civilian control of the military, the rule of law, and respect for individual rights; (2) does not engage in human rights violations, investigates and prosecutes those responsible for human rights violations, permits access to political prisoners by international organizations, and provides access to such organizations in situations of conflict or famine; (3) is not engaged in acts of armed aggression in violation of international law; and (4) is participating in the United Nations Register of Conventional Arms by annually reporting to the Register the number and type of conventional weapons possessed by, and transferred to and from, the country during the preceding year.

Authorizes an exemption from such prohibition for a fiscal year if: (1) the President requests an exemption from the Congress stating that it is in the national security interest to provide military assistance and arms transfers to a government; and (2) the Congress enacts a law approving such request.

Requires the President to submit initial certifications and requests for exemptions in conjunction with the submission of the annual request for enactment of authorizations and appropriations for foreign assistance.

Expresses the sense of the Congress that the House Foreign Affairs Committee and the Senate Foreign Relations Committee should hold hearings on controversial certifications and all requests for exemptions.