Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 11/19/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 11/19/1993
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6]* 11/19/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 11/19/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 11/19/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 11/19/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 11/19/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 11/19/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 11/19/1993
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 11/19/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 11/19/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 11/19/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 11/19/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 11/19/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5]* 11/19/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 11/19/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 11/19/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 11/19/1993
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 11/19/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 11/19/1993
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 11/19/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 11/19/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 11/20/1993
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 11/20/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 11/22/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 11/22/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 11/26/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 01/25/1994
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 01/25/1994
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 01/25/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/25/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/25/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 01/25/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/25/1994
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 01/25/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 01/26/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 01/26/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 01/26/1994
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 01/26/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 02/01/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/01/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 02/08/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/08/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 02/23/1994
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/23/1994
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 02/23/1994
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 02/23/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 02/23/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 02/23/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 02/23/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/23/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/03/1994
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 03/03/1994
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 03/03/1994
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/09/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 03/09/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 03/09/1994
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 03/09/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/18/1994
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 03/18/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/18/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 03/18/1994
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 03/18/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 03/18/1994
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/18/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 04/12/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 04/12/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/12/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 04/12/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 04/12/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/19/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/21/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/28/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/11/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 05/23/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 05/23/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 05/23/1994
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/23/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/09/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/09/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 06/23/1994
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/14/1994
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/14/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 07/14/1994
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5] 07/19/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 07/26/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 08/09/1994
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 08/09/1994
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 08/09/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 08/09/1994
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 09/12/1994
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 09/12/1994
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 09/12/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 09/12/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 09/23/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 09/23/1994
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/23/1994
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 10/04/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/04/1994