Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/21/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/27/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/13/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 07/22/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/29/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 08/01/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 08/01/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 08/01/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 08/01/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 09/12/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/22/1994