Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98]* 11/20/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 11/20/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 11/20/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 11/20/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 01/26/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 01/26/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/26/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 01/26/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 01/26/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 01/26/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/26/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 01/26/1994
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 01/26/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/26/1994
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 01/26/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 01/26/1994
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 01/26/1994
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 01/26/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 01/26/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/26/1994
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 01/26/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 01/26/1994
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 01/26/1994
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 01/26/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 01/26/1994
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 01/26/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/09/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 02/09/1994
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 02/09/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/09/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/09/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/09/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/09/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 02/09/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 02/09/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 02/09/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 02/09/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/09/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/09/1994
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/09/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 02/11/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 02/11/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 02/11/1994
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 02/11/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 02/11/1994
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/11/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/03/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/03/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/03/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/03/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 03/09/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 03/09/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/09/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 03/09/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/09/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 03/09/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/09/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/23/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/23/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/23/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 03/23/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 03/23/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/23/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/23/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/23/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 04/12/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 05/25/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/25/1994
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/25/1994
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 05/25/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/25/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 05/25/1994