Committees: H.R.3600 — 103rd Congress (1993-1994)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Armed Services11/20/1993 Referred to
07/26/1994 Markup by
07/28/1994 Reported by H.Rept 103-601 Part 3
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Forces and Personnel11/22/1993 Referred to
07/20/1994 Markup by
07/20/1994 Reported by
House Education and Labor11/20/1993 Referred to
06/23/1994 Markup by
07/22/1994 Reported by H.Rept 103-601 Part 2
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Labor Standards, Occupational Health and Safety04/19/1994 Referred to
04/20/1994 Hearings by
06/10/1994 Discharged from
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Postsecondary Education and Training04/19/1994 Referred to
06/10/1994 Discharged from
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary, and Vocational Education04/19/1994 Referred to
06/10/1994 Discharged from
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Labor-Management Relations04/19/1994 Referred to
05/25/1994 Markup by
05/25/1994 Reported by
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Human Resources04/19/1994 Referred to
06/10/1994 Discharged from
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Select Education and Civil Rights04/19/1994 Referred to
06/10/1994 Discharged from
House Government Operations11/20/1993 Referred to
07/27/1994 Markup by
08/12/1994 Reported by H.Rept 103-601 Part 5
House Government Operations Subcommittee on Information, Justice, Transportation, and Agriculture11/24/1993 Referred to
07/27/1994 Markup by
07/27/1994 Reported by
House Government Operations Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security11/24/1993 Referred to
03/17/1994 Hearings by
07/27/1994 Discharged from
House Government Operations Subcommittee on Human Resources and Intergovernmental Relations01/25/1994 Referred to
03/17/1994 Hearings by
07/27/1994 Markup by
07/27/1994 Reported by
House Energy and Commerce11/20/1993 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Competitiveness12/03/1993 Referred to
02/01/1994 Hearings by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment12/03/1993 Referred to
House Natural Resources11/20/1993 Referred to
07/20/1994 Markup by
10/06/1994 Reported by H.Rept 103-601 Part 6
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Native American Affairs01/21/1994 Referred to
05/03/1994 Hearings by
07/20/1994 Discharged from
House Judiciary11/20/1993 Referred to
08/02/1994 Markup by
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Economic and Commercial Law06/08/1994 Referred to
06/22/1994 Hearings by
08/02/1994 Discharged from
House Post Office and Civil Service11/20/1993 Referred to
02/08/1994 Hearings by
07/28/1994 Markup by
10/07/1994 Reported by H.Rept 103-601 Part 7
House Rules11/20/1993 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs11/20/1993 Referred to
07/21/1994 Markup by
08/02/1994 Reported by H.Rept 103-601 Part 4
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care11/23/1993 Referred to
05/11/1994 Markup by
05/11/1994 Reported by
House Ways and Means11/20/1993 Referred to
02/08/1994 Hearings by
06/30/1994 Markup by
07/14/1994 Reported by H.Rept 103-601 Part 1
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health11/24/1993 Referred to
02/07/1994 Hearings by
03/23/1994 Markup by
03/23/1994 Reported by
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Select Revenue Measures02/09/1994 Hearings by
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Social Security02/23/1994 Hearings by