Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 11/22/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 11/22/1993
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/11/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 02/11/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 02/11/1994
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/11/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 02/11/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/11/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/11/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 02/11/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/11/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 02/11/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 02/11/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/11/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 02/11/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 02/11/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/11/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/11/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/11/1994
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 02/11/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/11/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 02/11/1994
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 02/11/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 02/11/1994
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 02/11/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 02/11/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 02/11/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/11/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 02/11/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 02/11/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 02/11/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 02/11/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/11/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/11/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/11/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/11/1994
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/11/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 02/11/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 02/11/1994
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/11/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 02/11/1994
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 02/11/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/11/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 02/11/1994
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 02/11/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/11/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/11/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 02/11/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/11/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/11/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 02/11/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 02/22/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/03/1994
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 03/03/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 03/03/1994
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 03/03/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/03/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 03/03/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/03/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 03/03/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 03/03/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/16/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/16/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 03/16/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 03/16/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 03/16/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/16/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/16/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 04/12/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/12/1994
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/12/1994
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 04/12/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 05/23/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/23/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/23/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/23/1994
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 05/23/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/23/1994
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/23/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/25/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/25/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 07/25/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 07/25/1994