Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 11/22/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 11/22/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 11/22/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 11/22/1993
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 11/22/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 11/22/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 01/25/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 01/26/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 01/26/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 01/26/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 01/26/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/02/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/02/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 02/08/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 02/09/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/02/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/02/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/02/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/21/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/21/1994
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/11/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 07/19/1994
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 07/19/1994
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 08/04/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/12/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 10/04/1994
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 10/04/1994
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/04/1994
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 10/04/1994