There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Anti-Economic Discrimination Act of 1993

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To restrict sales and leases of defense articles and defense services to any country or international organization which as a matter of policy or practice is known to have sent letters to United States firms requesting compliance with, or soliciting information regarding compliance with, the secondary or tertiary Arab boycott.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/22/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
12/06/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
12/06/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on International Security, International Organizations and Human Rights.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
11/24/1993Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E3130-3131)
Action By: House of Representatives
11/22/1993Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/22/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (68)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/09/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/11/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 02/11/1994
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 02/23/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 02/23/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 03/08/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/11/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/11/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/11/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 03/11/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 03/16/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/16/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/16/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 03/16/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 03/16/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/16/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 03/16/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 03/16/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 03/16/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/22/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/22/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/22/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/22/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/22/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 03/22/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/22/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/23/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/23/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/23/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/24/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/24/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/12/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/12/1994
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 04/12/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/12/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/18/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/18/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/18/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 04/18/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/18/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/18/1994
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/02/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/02/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 05/02/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 05/02/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/11/1994
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/11/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 05/17/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 05/17/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/25/1994
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 05/25/1994

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs11/22/1993 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East12/06/1993 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on International Security, International Organizations, and Human Rights12/06/1993 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3656.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3656. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/22/1993)

Anti-Economic Discrimination Act of 1993 - Prohibits the sale or lease of defense articles or services by the U.S. Government to any country or international organization that is known to have sent letters to U.S. firms requesting compliance with, or soliciting information regarding compliance with, the secondary or tertiary Arab boycott unless the President certifies to the relevant congressional committees that the country or organization does not currently send such letters.

Authorizes the President to waive such prohibition for a period of one year if the waiver is: (1) in the national interest and will promote objectives to eliminate the Arab boycott; or (2) in the national security interest. Provides for extensions of waivers upon notification of the relevant congressional committees.