Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/25/1994
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/22/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 02/22/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/11/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/11/1994
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/11/1994
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/11/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/18/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/18/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 06/10/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 06/10/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/10/1994
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 06/13/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/13/1994
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/27/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/13/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 07/13/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/13/1994
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/13/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/20/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/20/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/20/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/20/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 07/20/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 07/20/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 07/25/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 08/04/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 08/04/1994
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 08/12/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 08/12/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 09/30/1994