Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/25/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4]* 01/25/1994
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 01/25/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 01/25/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/25/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 01/25/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 01/25/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 01/25/1994
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 01/25/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 01/25/1994
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 01/25/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 01/25/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 01/25/1994
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 01/25/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 01/25/1994
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 01/25/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 01/25/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 01/25/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 01/25/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/25/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 01/25/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 01/26/1994
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 01/26/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/26/1994
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 01/26/1994
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 01/26/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/26/1994
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 01/26/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/26/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/26/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 01/26/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/01/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/01/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 02/01/1994
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/01/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/01/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 02/02/1994
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/02/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 02/02/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 02/02/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/02/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/02/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 02/02/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/02/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 02/02/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 02/03/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/08/1994
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 02/09/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 02/09/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 02/10/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/10/1994
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 02/10/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 02/10/1994
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/10/1994
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 02/10/1994
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 02/10/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/22/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 02/22/1994
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/22/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 02/22/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/22/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/08/1994
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 04/12/1994
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 04/12/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/25/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/25/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 05/25/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 09/12/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 09/27/1994